+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and title amendment
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 890 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2 as amended
- Substitute s-2 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2 and amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On October 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on insurance
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 536 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On September 18, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/18/2014
On September 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pete Lund
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor