+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:56 PM
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 775 yeas 34 nays 3 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 605 Yeas 99 Nays 8
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Substitute H-2 not adopted
- Read a second time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/07/2016
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Al Pscholka
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor