+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 594'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 3:37 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:00 PM
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 5:52 PM
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 903 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 860 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 437 Yeas 105 Nays 2
- Transmitted
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/17/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Vanessa Guerra