+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:24 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 882 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government and elections
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 568 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 17, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/17/2014
On September 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ken Yonker
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor