+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 617 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/07/2016
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Amanda Price
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor