+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 125'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/01/2020 01:44 PM
- Approved by the Governor 07/01/2020 10:56 AM
- Presented to the Governor 06/30/2020 01:32 PM
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 226 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 253 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Full title agreed to
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-6) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-6)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/02/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sarah Anthony