+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 246'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:24 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2018 @ 9:32 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:52 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 495 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 326 Yeas 105 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/12/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Bizon
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor