+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 409 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/12/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pamela Hornberger