+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 431'14 with immediate effect 2014 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/29/2014 @ 8:04 PM 2014 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:46 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:52 AM
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 690 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 816 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on banking and financial institutions
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 565 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 11, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/11/2014
On September 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Services
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mike Callton
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor