+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 180'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/11/2018 @ 2:24 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/11/2018 @ 9:19 AM
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/4/2018 @ 12:17 PM
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 370 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 266 Yeas 105 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/10/2018
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Roger Hauck
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor