+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 285'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/28/2018 @ 7:04 AM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:54 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/29/2018 @ 11:14 AM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 464 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 314 Yeas 104 Nays 4
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/10/2018
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Beth Griffin