+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 128'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/29/2022 02:36 PM
- Approved by the Governor 06/29/2022 01:16 PM
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/21/2022 11:00 AM
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 309 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/16/2022
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bryan Posthumus
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor