+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:20 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 765 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 841 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On October 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 518 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 10, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/10/2014
On September 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kenneth Kurtz
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor