+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 12/27/2018
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/20/2018 @ 3:14 PM
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 813 Yeas 77 Nays 32
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 759 yeas 34 nays 4 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 77 Nays 31
- Read a third time
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/14/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Rob VerHeulen
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor