+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 546'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:42 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:57 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 5:46 PM
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 883 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 722 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/14/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Lilly
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor