+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On September 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Transmitted
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/02/2022
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor