+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 849 Yeas 104 Nays 5
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/08/2017
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Aaron Miller
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor