+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 48'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/23/2022 11:04 AM
- Approved by the Governor 03/23/2022 10:01 AM
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 03/21/2022 01:38 PM
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 93 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 90 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/27/2022
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Scott VanSingel
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor