+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On September 10, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 363 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On September 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/25/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tenisha Yancey
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor