+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On July 21, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 320 Yeas 101 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/25/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ronnie Peterson
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor