+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 123 Yeas 88 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/25/2022
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mike Mueller
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor