+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government and elections
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 589 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 11, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Local Government
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 06/13/2014
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Eileen Kowall
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor