+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 372'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/17/2018 @ 2:58 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/17/2018 @ 10:36 AM
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/7/2018 @ 2:06 PM
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 661 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 405 Yeas 104 Nays 5
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/27/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Laura Cox
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor