+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 336'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 7/2/2018 @ 1:22 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/28/2018 @ 6:48 AM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:02 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 440 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 183 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/27/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Liability Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Eric Leutheuser
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor