+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 314'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/26/2016 @ 3:22 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/26/2016 @ 3:03 PM
- Presented to the Governor 10/20/2016 @ 3:26 PM
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On October 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 542 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on veterans, military affairs and homeland security
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 375 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Substitute H-1 not adopted
- Read a second time
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/11/2016
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Holly Hughes
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor