+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 209'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/22/2018 @ 1:58 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/21/2018 @ 2:33 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/11/2018 @ 11:02 AM
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 396 yeas 30 nays 7 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 344 Yeas 93 Nays 15
- Read a third time
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-5 adopted
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/22/2018
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Aaron Miller
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor