+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 166 Yeas 80 Nays 28
- Read a third time
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/21/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pamela Hornberger
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor