+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 360'16 with immediate effect
- Presented to the Governor 12/20/2016 @ 4:22 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/22/2016 @ 10:54 AM
- Approved by the Governor 12/21/2016 @ 7:48 PM
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 673 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-4 concurred in
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 734 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-4
- Substitute s-4 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-4
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-4 with immediate effect and full title
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-6 adopted
- Substitute H-5 not adopted
- Read a second time
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-5
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/03/2016
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andy Schor