+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 17, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 187'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/25/2022 10:48 AM
- Approved by the Governor 07/25/2022 09:34 AM
On July 20, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 07/11/2022 01:08 PM
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 381 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-2) with immediate effect and title amendment
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title amended
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute (S-2) concurred in
- Roll call Roll Call # 346 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Laid over one day under the rules
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 101 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted and amended
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 12/07/2021
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle