+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 607 Yeas 100 Nays 9
- Read a third time
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/16/2014
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Joe Haveman
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor