+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 189'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/20/2014 @ 3:56 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/19/2014 @ 10:40 AM
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/10/2014 @ 11:38 AM
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 337 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 291 Yeas 98 Nays 12
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/14/2014
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Detroit's Recovery and Michigan's Future
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Joe Haveman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor