+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 373'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 01/04/2021 12:38 PM
- Approved by the Governor 01/04/2021 10:16 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 05:23 PM
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 498 yeas 33 nays 5 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 275 Yeas 101 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Transmitted
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/03/2020
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Triston Cole