+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 5, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report received
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to conference committee 05/24/2018
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/24/2018: sens. marty knollenberg, james marleau, coleman young
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Senate conferees named 05/24/2018: Sens. Marty Knollenberg James Marleau Coleman Young
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/23/2018: Reps. Tommy Brann Chris Afendoulis Ronnie Peterson
- Roll Call # 369 Yeas 0 Nays 109
- Senate substitute S-1 nonconcurred in
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Passed roll call # 322 yeas 26 nays 10 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 302 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/14/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tommy Brann
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor