+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 182'14 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/19/2014 @ 10:20 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/20/2014 @ 3:42 PM
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/10/2014 @ 11:24 AM
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 334 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 105 Nays 5
- Transmitted
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/09/2014
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Detroit's Recovery and Michigan's Future
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Kivela
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor