+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 292'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/29/2020 01:56 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/29/2020 10:06 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 06:33 PM
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 525 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 379 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On September 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/27/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Alex Garza
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor