+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 337'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/14/2016 @ 3:22 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/14/2016 @ 10:46 AM
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/5/2016 @ 4:22 PM
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 650 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 282 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/12/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gary Howell
+ − Sponsor
Gary Howell
Type:
Primary Sponsor