+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 59'22 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 04/07/2022 12:08 PM
- Presented to the Governor 03/28/2022 01:42 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 04/07/2022 02:56 PM
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 100 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 7 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/09/2021
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andrew Fink
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor