+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 144'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/10/2018 @ 11:02 AM
- Approved by the Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:48 PM
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 5/2/2018 @ 10:02 AM
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 253 Yeas 106 Nays 3
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 233 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Rule suspended
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 146 Yeas 106 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/07/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lana Theis
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor