+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 304'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/9/2014 @ 4:13 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/9/2014 @ 12:40 PM
- Presented to the Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:58 PM
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 508 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On September 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 570 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 392 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/02/2014
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter MacGregor
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor