+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 154'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 09/17/2020 11:38 AM
- Approved by the Governor 09/17/2020 10:23 AM
On September 10, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/14/2020 01:51 PM
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 279 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/20/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Scott VanSingel
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor