+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 305'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/4/2016 @ 3:16 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/3/2016 @ 8:50 PM
- Presented to the Governor 9/28/2016 @ 4:16 PM
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 489 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 312 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/22/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kathy Crawford