+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on veterans, military affairs and homeland security
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 382 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 05/01/2014
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Robert Kosowski
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor