+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 8, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 255'22
- Approved by the Governor 12/22/2022 02:20 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/13/2022 11:12 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/22/2022 04:06 PM
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- PASSED ROLL CALL # 542 YEAS 31 NAYS 0 EXCUSED 7 NOT VOTING 0
- IMMEDIATE EFFECT DEFEATED
- PLACED ON IMMEDIATE PASSAGE
- RULES SUSPENDED
On December 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On December 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 604 Yeas 95 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/28/2021
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Felicia Brabec
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor