+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 235'14 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:08 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/19/2014 @ 12:18 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/27/2014 @ 1:57 PM
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 487 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on reforms, restructuring and reinventing
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/30/2014
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Harvey Santana
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor