+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 466 Yeas 100 Nays 6
- Read a third time
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/16/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Bizon
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor