+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 152 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/15/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ed McBroom
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor