+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 569 Yeas 106 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 04/18/2014
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mike Shirkey
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor