+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 658'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 7:08 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 5:37 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:04 PM
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 967 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 112 Yeas 106 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/24/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mary Whiteford
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor