+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 286'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 9/27/2016 @ 1:56 PM
- Approved by the Governor 9/27/2016 @ 10:32 AM
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 9/21/2016 @ 3:32 PM
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 507 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 350 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Per Rule 41 referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/08/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andrea LaFontaine