+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 289 Yeas 81 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/20/2021
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government and Municipal Finance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gary Howell